This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/10/2022 at 08:17:03 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC, vs. CELINA A LAIRSON

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CELINA A LAIRSON. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5394

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC,

P.O. Box 1592

Mckinney, TX 75070

Defendant

LAIRSON, CELINA A

Arlington, TX 76012-4116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lacie Elizabeth Friday

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: ASKED ABOUT DEFAULT JUDGMENT. STATED SENT LETTER TO PLTF REGARDING INABILITY TO PAY AMOUNT AND DEMANDING PROOF OF DEBT. ADVISED DEFN THAT COURT DID NOT REC RESPONSE FROM DEFN AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT WAS GRANTED. DEFN ASKED FOR OPTIONS AFTER JUDGMENT. ADVISED OF APPEAL INFO. $6,283 BOND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $3,355.66; Awarded To: LVNV FUNDING LLC,; Awarded Against: CELINA A LAIRSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketEmailed: REINSTATEMENT TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketOrder of Reinstatement Entered (OCA Reactivated)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketProposed Order: MT Reinstate proposed order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketMotion to Reinstate Filed: Motion to reinstate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketMotion Filed: 6085742 Sub serve affidavits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2022-00311: LVNV FUNDING LLC,: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff LVNV FUNDING LLC,; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO EZ; LAIRSON, CELINA A: Served: 02/01/2022; Returned: 02/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: 6085742 LAIRSON PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lacie Friday