This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/09/2021 at 04:07:27 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Carol Warner

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Carol Warner. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9957

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Warner, Carol

North Richland Hills, TX 76182

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) : 01/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service// EFILED// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCITATION: ABC/KAC; Warner, Carol: Served: 10/28/2021; Returned: 11/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CIT AND PET TO ABC FOR SERVICE //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2021-01052: Lvnv Funding Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper