This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/21/2020 at 07:16:17 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs. BRANDON WHITE

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 LVNV FUNDING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRANDON WHITE. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0146

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Defendant

WHITE, BRANDON

Arlington, TX 76006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex Anshul Munjal

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: ON FEBRUARY 11, 2020, CITATION RETURNED UNEXECUTED, BAD ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCITATION: ABC; WHITE, BRANDON: Returned Unserved 02/11/2020; Returned: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed: WITH CITATIONS ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06133: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff LVNV FUNDING, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCITATION: WHITE, BRANDON: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less