This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/19/2020 at 23:58:59 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs. BILL VIANA

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 LVNV FUNDING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BILL VIANA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0130

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Defendant

VIANA, BILL

Arlington, TX 76010

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyla Nicole Baxter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $4,286.33; Awarded To: LVNV FUNDING, LLC; Awarded Against: BILL VIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMailed default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketEmailed: DEFAULT TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Granted: FOR PLTF $4286.33 PLUS CC & INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06133: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff LVNV FUNDING, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCITATION: VIANA, BILL: Served: 12/14/2019; Returned: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less