This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/23/2022 at 13:33:41 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Angela Swank

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Angela Swank. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7249

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

4548 S. Atherton Dr. Ste. 1000

Salt Lake City, UT 84123

Defendant

Swank, Angela

Fort Worth, TX 76179-2949

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lacie Elizabeth Friday

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : 09/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 6/7/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-2278: LVNV Funding LLC: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO TXEFILE@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lacie Friday