This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/19/2020 at 23:59:07 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs. ALYSSA MULLINS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 LVNV FUNDING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALYSSA MULLINS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0137

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Defendant

MULLINS, ALYSSA

Arlington, TX 76006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID E KIRKENDALL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $2,190.10; Awarded To: LVNV FUNDING, LLC; Awarded Against: ALYSSA MULLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEmailed: DEFAULT TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketMailed default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Granted: FOR PLTF $2190.10 PLUS CC & INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06133: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff LVNV FUNDING, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCITATION: MULLINS, ALYSSA: Served: 12/27/2019; Returned: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less