This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/30/2022 at 05:20:51 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Alan B Peel

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Alan B Peel. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1648

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Peel, Alan B

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Defendant Attorney

Jerry J. Jarzombek

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEmailed: SIGNED ORDER TO DEFN ATTY/ NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Leave/Request for Discovery: Order Granting Defendant's Preliminary Motion Regarding Discovery and Evidence//EFILED// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCalled Defendant's Attorney on this Case: SPOKE W/ ATTY RE: REJECTED FILING ON MTN FOR DISCOVERY// FOR ATTY TO REFILE AND CT WILL ACCEPT IT// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketMotion for Leave/Permission for Discovery Filed: Defendant's Motion Regarding Discovery and Evidence//EFILED BY DEFN ATTY//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketE-File Filing Rejected: DEFN'S ATTY MTN FOR DISCOVERY/ THE REQUEST (EXHIBIT A) WAS MISSING DEFN ATTY'S SIGNATURE/ AND NO CERT. OF CONFERENCE WAS ATTACHED TO THAT REQ. FOR DISCOVERY// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCourt Notes: UPDATED SERVICE AND FINANCIAL TAB//FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant's Original Answer// EFILED// BY DEFN'S ATTY/ FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service/EFILED/HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-02743: Lvnv Funding Llc: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CITN AND PETN TO PPS//FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAIL TO ABCLEGAL//FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper