This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/16/2017 at 00:18:38 (UTC).

LOFTON PLACE APARTMENTS vs. KENDRICK WALKER AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 06/14/2016 LOFTON PLACE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KENDRICK WALKER AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6148

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOFTON PLACE APARTMENTS

1601 Eastchase Pkwy

Fort Worth, TX 76120

Defendant

WALKER, KENDRICK

Fort Worth, TX 76120

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2016
  • Dispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $908.93; Awarded To: LOFTON PLACE APARTMENTS; Awarded Against: KENDRICK WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Writ of Possession Returned: EXECUTED AND REAL PROPERTY TO ITS RIGHTFUL OWNER..RDK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION: WALKER, KENDRICK: Served: 07/12/2016; Returned: 07/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Writ of Possession Requested: BTW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • During the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is: 685.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Bond for Appeal Set: 1400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Evict -Judgment / Pltf / Poss/ Past Due Rent / CC: $908.93 + CC - BTW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Hearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Comments: RET EXECUTED TO KENDRICK WALKER 8401-1914 BELLCHASE DR FORT WORTH, TX 76120 ;COURT DATE 06/27/16 AT 8:30AM MLH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • EVICTION: WALKER, KENDRICK: Served: 06/15/2016; Returned: 06/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2016-02339: LOFTON PLACE APARTMENTS: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2016-02024: LOFTON PLACE APARTMENTS: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff LOFTON PLACE APARTMENTS; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due as of 02/15/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lofton Place Apartments is a litigant