This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/05/2021 at 22:37:03 (UTC).

Lincoln Factoring vs. Midland National Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Lincoln Factoring filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Midland National Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0340

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lincoln Factoring

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Defendants

Midland National Life Insurance Company

211 East 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

SERVE CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY

211 East 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Gary Engfer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMailed: DISM TO DEFN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEmailed: DISMISSAL TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Sanders, Kenneth D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal With Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss: Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Midland National Life Insurance Company: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO REQUESTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2021-02966: Lincoln Factoring: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lincoln Factoring; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Original Petition//MISSING MILITARY AFF // EMAIL TO: dick@sryp.net HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Gary Engfer