This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/15/2022 at 21:34:40 (UTC).

Lincoln Factoring vs. Liberty Mutual Insurance COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Lincoln Factoring filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance COMPANY. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0614

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lincoln Factoring

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Defendants

Liberty Mutual Insurance COMPANY

211 East 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

SERVE CSC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Gary Engfer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/ 60 Day; (8:00 AM) () ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: EMAILED TO PLTF // MLD TO DEFN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketEmailed: FRWD COPY OF EMAIL THAT WAS SENT ON 2/1/22; ALL DOCS WERE ATTACHED WHEN THAT EMAIL SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCITATION: Liberty Mutual Insurance COMPANY: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-00547: Lincoln Factoring: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lincoln Factoring; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Original Petition//mike@sryp.net

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where serve: CSC is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Gary Engfer