This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/14/2017 at 14:19:54 (UTC).

LEOBARDO MIRAMONTES VS. RAMIRO REYES

Case Summary

On 12/15/2015 LEOBARDO MIRAMONTES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAMIRO REYES. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4648

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRAMONTES, LEOBARDO

Fort Worth, TX 76164

Defendant

REYES, RAMIRO

Fort Worth, TX 76164

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2016
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment of $2,250.00; Awarded To: LEOBARDO MIRAMONTES; Awarded Against: RAMIRO REYES; Comment: COPY OF JUDGMENT MLD TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Writ of Execution Returned Nulla Bona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION: WRIT ISSD TO C05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Writ of Execution Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • Default Notice Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial: (1:30 PM) () : Result: Judgment: 01-08-16: SETTING LTRS ALONG W/NOTICE RE: INTERPRETERS MLD TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Letter/Notice Returned Undelivered: SETTING LTR MLD TO DEFT RETD; INSUFFICIENT ADD; UNABLE TO FWD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Answer Filed: BY DEFT PRO SE, VIA FAX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Defendant Contacted Court: STATED HE WILL BE FILING WRITTEN ANSWER BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Comments: CITN RETD/EXECUTED 12-17-15/IN PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • CITATION: CITN ISSD TO C05;; REYES, RAMIRO: Served: 12/17/2015: Response Received: 01/07/2016; Returned: 12/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2016-01255: MIRAMONTES, LEOBARDO: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2015-02932: MIRAMONTES, LEOBARDO: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Transaction Assessment: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff MIRAMONTES, LEOBARDO; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due as of 02/14/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    Read MoreRead Less