Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/09/2017 at 20:25:43 (UTC).

Leland Pennington, Inc. vs Michael S. Clem, Steven A. Clem, Brooktexlyn LLC, Gregory L. Roslund, Jennifer L. Roslund

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 Leland Pennington, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael S Clem, Steven A Clem, Brooktexlyn LLC, Gregory L Roslund, Jennifer L Roslund. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********50-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leland Pennington, Inc.

Defendants

Clem, Steven A.

Dallas, TX 75225

Clem, Michael S.

Pflugerville, TX 78660

Roslund, Jennifer L.

Dallas, TX 75225

b/s Seth Koppel, its registered agent

Austin, TX 78730

Roslund, Gregory L.

Dallas, TX 75225

Brooktexlyn LLC

9850 Westminster Avenue

Austin, TX 78730

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C. D. Peebles

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2017
  • Order for Non-Suit Doc ID# 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Motion for Non Suit Doc ID# 6: as to Brooktexlyn LLC, Gregory L. & Jennifer Roslund

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 5: Original Citation- Jennifer L. Roslund

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 4: Original Citation- Gregory L. Roslund

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Citation: mailed to Attorney; Clem, Michael S.: Served: 01/14/2017; Returned: 01/17/2017; Clem, Steven A.: Unserved ; Brooktexlyn LLC: Unserved ; Roslund, Gregory L.: Served: 01/05/2017; Returned: 01/05/2017; Roslund, Jennifer L.: Served: 01/04/2017; Returned: 01/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-117491: Leland Pennington, Inc.: (269.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Leland Pennington, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 269.00; Total Payments and Credits: 269.00; Balance Due as of 02/09/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 269.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer C.D. Peebles