Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/31/2021 at 13:32:28 (UTC).

Layan Real Estate LLC vs. David M John and all occupants

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Layan Real Estate LLC filed an Other lawsuit against David M John and all occupants. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are sGregory, Christopher,Gregory, Christopher, s Gregory, Christopher, Gregory, Christopher and Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0486

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

sGregory, Christopher,Gregory, Christopher

s Gregory, Christopher, Gregory, Christopher

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Layan Real Estate LLC

7227 Tolosa

Grand Prairie, TX 75054

Defendant

John, David M

Fort Worth, TX 76179

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Defendant; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher) ; Judgment; Awarded To: David John; Awarded Against: Layan Real Estate LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketHearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Gregory, Christopher, Gregory, Christopher) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEmailed: zoom link to pltf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketRequest For Zoom Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: Constable Advised the defn had called again this morning and is waiting for them to hang paper so she can have the neighbor get it

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-2117: Layan Real Estate LLC: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Layan Real Estate LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCITATION: John, David M: Served: 04/20/2021; Returned: 04/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEmailed: PLTF TO LET HER KNOW, I NEED TO CHANGE HER COURT TIME FROM 9:00 TO 10:00./CAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less