Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/30/2017 at 05:00:34 (UTC).

LaShona Langrum vs Tarragona Investments Group, LLC, Red Lobster Management, LLC, and Red Lobster of Texas, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/13/2017 LaShona Langrum filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Tarragona Investments Group, LLC, Red Lobster Management, LLC, and Red Lobster of Texas, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********81-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Langrum, LaShona

Defendants

Red Lobster of Texas, LLC

2425 W. Loop South #200

Houston, TX 77027

b/s C T Corporation System, its registered agent

1999 Bryan Street, Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Red Lobster Management, LLC

2425 W. Loop South #200

Houston, TX 77027

Tarragona Investments Group, LLC

1999 Bryan Street, Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

b/s Corporate Creations Network, Inc., its registered agent

2425 W. Loop South #200

Houston, TX 77027

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Provost

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Citation: mailed to Attorney; Tarragona Investments Group, LLC: Served: 02/28/2017; Returned: 03/06/2017; Red Lobster Managment, LLC: Served: 02/28/2017; Returned: 03/06/2017; Red Lobster of Texas, LLC: Served: 02/28/2017; Returned: 03/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2: and Written Discovery to Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-119274: Langrum, LaShona: (261.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Langrum, LaShona; Total Financial Assessment: 261.00; Total Payments and Credits: 261.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 261.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant