This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/16/2017 at 00:18:30 (UTC).

LAS MARIPOSAS APTS. vs. SUSANNE WOODS AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 06/14/2016 LAS MARIPOSAS APTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SUSANNE WOODS AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6145

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAS MARIPOSAS APTS.

2100 E Loop 820

Fort Worth, TX 76112

Defendant

WOODS, SUSANNE

Fort Worth, TX 76112

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2016
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $1,620.09; Awarded To: LAS MARIPOSAS APTS.; Awarded Against: SUSANNE WOODS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Writ of Possession Returned: EXECUTED AND REAL PROPERTY TO ITS RIGHTFUL OWNER..RDK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION: WOODS, SUSANNE: Served: 07/12/2016; Returned: 07/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Writ of Possession Requested: BY PLTF AGENT (PTINTED)**CDN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • During the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is: 800.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Bond for Appeal Set: 1600.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Evict - Default Judgment for Poss, & Past Due Rent: $1620.09 + CC - BTW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Default Notice Mailed: BTW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Hearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Comments: RET EXECUTED TO SUSANNE WOODS 2152-51 E LOOP 820 FT WORTH, TX 76112 ;COURT DATE 06/27/16 AT 8:30AM MLH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • EVICTION: WOODS, SUSANNE: Served: 06/15/2016; Returned: 06/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2016-02313: LAS MARIPOSAS APTS.: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2016-02022: LAS MARIPOSAS APTS.: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff LAS MARIPOSAS APTS.; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due as of 02/15/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAS MARIPOSAS APTS is a litigant