Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/09/2017 at 22:59:16 (UTC).

La Tia Martin a/k/a Latia T. Monk-Martin vs Discover Bank and Law Offices of Allen & Withrow

Case Summary

On 01/11/2017 La Tia Martin a/k/a Latia T Monk-Martin filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Discover Bank and Law Offices of Allen Withrow. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********84-3

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

a/k/a Latia T. Monk-Martin

Martin, La Tia

Defendants

Discover Bank

100 West Market, P.O. Box C

Greenwood, DE 19950

Law Offices of Allen & Withrow

12410 Cantrell Road, Suite 100

Little Rock, AR 72223

b/s Any Partner

Little Rock, AR 72223

b/s Discover Bank, Registered Agent

100 West Market, P.O. Box C

Greenwood, DE 19950

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R. Douglas Scott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2017
  • Week of NonJury Trial Scheduling Only (Disregard Start Time): (7:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Temporary Injunction Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Temporary Injunction Order Doc ID# 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Letter Doc ID# 7: Issue Temporary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Temporary Restraining Order: (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Hrabal, Mike) : Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Temporary Injunction Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Citation: Discover Bank: Unserved ; Law Offices of Allen & Withrow: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Certificate of Cash Bond Doc ID# 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Letter Doc ID# 6: Re: Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Request: Issue Citation and Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Temporary Injunction Order Doc ID# 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 2: Request for Injunction and Request for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-118749: Martin, La Tia: (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Transaction Assessment: 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-118398: Martin, La Tia: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-118155: Martin, La Tia: (249.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Martin, La Tia; Total Financial Assessment: 303.00; Total Payments and Credits: 303.00; Balance Due as of 02/09/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 249.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R. Douglas Scott