Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/06/2020 at 14:06:58 (UTC).

Kimberly A. Martinez vs Uber Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 Kimberly A Martinez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Uber Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********14-3

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martinez, Kimberly A.

Defendants

B/S Registered Agent, CT Corporation

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

Uber Technologies, Inc.

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen C. Maxwell

Defendant Attorney

Jillian Van Rensburg Keith

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #6: electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Dismissal With Prejudice; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal With Prejudice Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index #4: Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.s' Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketCitation: Mail to Attorney Office ; Uber Technologies, Inc.: Served: 11/06/2019; Returned: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-154200: Martinez, Kimberly A.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Martinez, Kimberly A.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2: Original Petition with Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen C. Maxwell