This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/24/2022 at 01:13:23 (UTC).

Khanh Le vs City of Fort Worth Zoning Board of Adjustment

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Khanh Le filed an Other lawsuit against City of Fort Worth Zoning Board of Adjustment. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********76-1

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Le, Khanh

Fort Worth, TX 76017

Defendants

City of Fort Worth Zoning Board of Adjustment-Residential

Fort Worth, TX 76102

b/s Acting City Secretary, Ronald P. Gonzales

City Hall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason D Tomlin

Defendant Attorney

Christopher B. Mosley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Hearing; (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Pierson, Don) ; Other; Motion to Quash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement Index # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketMotion: Amended Motion to Withdraw its Motion to Quash Request for Production, Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketMotion: to Withdraw it's Motion to Quash Plaintiff Request for Production, Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Motion; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Pierson, Don) ; Other; Motion to Quash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing / Trial Index # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance of Counsel Index # 13: for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement Index # 12: (Postpone Discover Deadline)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketMotion to Quash Index # 11: Request for Production, Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketRecord - Other: CD Exhibits to the Return of the Zoning Board of Adjustments of the City of Fort Worth

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: City of Fort Worth Zoning Board of Adjustment-Residential

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-178509: Le, Khanh: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCitation: E-mailed to Attorney; City of Fort Worth Zoning Board of Adjustment-Residential: Served: 12/22/2021; Returned: 12/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: RE: Issuance of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-177400: Le, Khanh: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Le, Khanh; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: Verified Petition for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY HALL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason D Tomlin