This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/03/2022 at 00:55:43 (UTC).

KHADIJAH MILLER vs. HOME RIVER GROUP DFW PROPERTY MGMT

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 KHADIJAH MILLER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOME RIVER GROUP DFW PROPERTY MGMT. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5189

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER, KHADIJAH

Crowley, TX 76036

Defendant

HOME RIVER GROUP DFW PROPERTY MGMT

5308 West Plano Park Suite 100

Plano, TX 75093

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Israel L. Suster

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Charbonnet, Jason M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMotion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-06286: MILLER, KHADIJAH: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MILLER, KHADIJAH; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMailed Citation to Constable/Sheriff - Out of County Service:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCITATION: HOME RIVER GROUP DFW PROPERTY MGMT: Served: 09/15/2021; Returned: 10/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Israel L. Suster