Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/12/2021 at 09:12:23 (UTC).

Kenneth Vowell vs Ex Parte

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Kenneth Vowell filed an Other lawsuit against Ex Parte. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********83-3

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vowell, Kenneth

Euless, TX 76040

Defendant

Ex Parte

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mimi Coffey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171832: Vowell, Kenneth: (18.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 18.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketRequest: Vowell - Req for Cert Copies of ODL Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketRule 306a Notice of Final DJ or Appealable Order Index # 4: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171048: Vowell, Kenneth: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Vowell, Kenneth; Total Financial Assessment: 272.00; Total Payments and Credits: 272.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: Vowell - ODL Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPetition - Occupational Drivers License Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mimi Coffey