Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/13/2021 at 08:06:04 (UTC).

Kendrick Green vs Avery London McCord

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Kendrick Green filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Avery London McCord. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********44-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Green, Kendrick

Defendant

McCord, Avery London

Mansfield, TX 76063

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James R. Baudhuin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: (Avery London McCord)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold for attorney p/u - picked up 4/6/2021; McCord, Avery London: Served: 04/13/2021; Returned: 04/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171135: Green, Kendrick: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Green, Kendrick; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James R. Baudhuin