Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/02/2021 at 21:05:35 (UTC).

Kair Medical, Inc. vs Gibbons TX Management, LLC dba Heritage Oaks dba The Viridian at Arlington

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 Kair Medical, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Gibbons TX Management, LLC dba Heritage Oaks dba The Viridian at Arlington. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********64-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kair Medical, Inc.

Defendants

B/s its Reg Agent, VCORP SERVICES, LLC

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Gibbons TX Management, LLC

1981 Marcus Ave., #C129

New Hyde Park, NY 11042-1017

dba Heritage Oaks dba The Viridian at Arlington

Dallas, TX 75201

A limited liability company, dba Heritage Oaks dba The Viridian at Arlington

1981 Marcus Ave., #C129

New Hyde Park, NY 11042-1017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly A. Guest

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMotion: (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerPierson, Don) : Motion to Vacate Turnover Order and Order Appointing Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Index #19: Supplement to Motion to Vacate Turnover Order and Order Appointing Receiver Bill Hammer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing / Trial Index #18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketMotion: to Vacate Turnover Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketOath Index #17: of Receiver (Duplicate/Mailed In) "QC complete".VS (07-30-2020),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #16: Re: Oath of Receiver (Duplicate/Mailed In)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketOath Index #15: of Receiver "QC complete".VS (07-29-2020),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #14: Re: Oath of Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #12: Electronically Served and/or mailed to all attorneys and Pro Se Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketOrder for Turnover Index #13: and Order Appointing Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Default Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #6: Re: Motion and Order for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default W/Supporting Affidavits Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-158827: Kair Medical, Inc.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Kair Medical, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCitation: mailed 2/27; Gibbons TX Management, LLC: Served: 03/06/2020; Returned: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gibbons TX Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly A. Guest