This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/16/2017 at 01:39:14 (UTC).

JUDY E LEE VS. JOSE J GARCIA

Case Summary

On 08/08/2014 JUDY E LEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOSE J GARCIA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4211

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE, JUDY E

Defendant

GARCIA, JOSE J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment of $9,900.00; Awarded To: JUDY LEE; Awarded Against: JOSE GARCIA; Comment: COPY OF JUDGMENT MLD TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • DocketDefault Notice Mailed: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • DocketPlaintiff Filed: IN OPEN COURT, NOTICE OF NEW ADDRESS FOR DEFT & LICENSE PLATE #: DJY 3655; BMW SMALL BLACK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (10:30 AM) () : Result: Judgment: 10-20-14: SETTING LTRS ALONG W/NOTICE RE: INTERPRETERS MLD TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DocketComments: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : PLTF & DEFT APP; PER JUDGE, SET FOR TRIAL W/IN 90 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DocketProve Up Hearings: (2:00 PM) () : Result: Reset: 10-15-14: RESET PER JUDGE; SPOKE W/PLTF & DEFT TO ADVISE OF SAME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DocketCANCELED: Prove Up Hearings; (10:00 AM) () ; Other; 09-05-14: SETTING LTRS ALONG W/NOTICE RE: INTERPRETERS MLD TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • DocketComments: CITN RETD/EXECUTED 08-18-14/IN PERSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • DocketCITATION: CITN ISSD TO C05;; GARCIA, JOSE J: Served: 08/18/2014; Returned: 08/20/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2014-01245: LEE, JUDY E: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff LEE, JUDY E; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less