This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/06/2022 at 22:09:35 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A. vs. TUYETNHUNG T TRAN

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TUYETNHUNG T TRAN. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5783

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

TRAN, TUYETNHUNG T

Arlington, TX 76002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/ 60 Day; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Sanders, Kenneth D) ; Judgment of $11,850.28; Awarded To: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.; Awarded Against: TUYETNHUNG TRAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2022
  • DocketEmailed: TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2022
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed: Agreed Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCITATION: TRAN, TUYETNHUNG T: Served: 02/17/2022; Returned: 02/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-00600: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: mjscourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper