This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/25/2022 at 22:31:25 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. vs. NICK E LUMBRERAS AKA NICHOLAS LUMBRERAS

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NICK E LUMBRERAS AKA NICHOLAS LUMBRERAS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7427

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

P.O. Box 65020

Lubbock, TX 79464

Defendants

LUMBRERAS Aka NICHOLAS LUMBRERAS, NICK E

1428 Ravenwood Dr

Mansfield, TX 76063-6054

NICK E LUMBRERAS AKA NICHOLAS LUMBRERAS

Mansfield, TX 76063-6054

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/ 60 Day: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCITATION: NICK E LUMBRERAS AKA NICHOLAS LUMBRERAS: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-05826: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)//to efiling@pcpusa.net

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss