This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/05/2022 at 00:04:58 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. vs. JOE A BLANCHETTE

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOE A BLANCHETTE. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7429

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

P.O. Box 65020

Lubbock, TX 79464

Defendant

BLANCHETTE, JOE A

Arlington, TX 76001-5132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCITATION: BLANCHETTE, JOE A: Served: 07/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-05828: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)// to efiling@pcpusa.net

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss