This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/14/2022 at 12:22:20 (UTC).

Jpmorgan Chase Bank N.a. vs. Jack V Dennis, JR

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Jpmorgan Chase Bank N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jack. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6343

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jpmorgan Chase Bank N.a.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Dennis, Jack V, JR

Arlington, TX 76010

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEmailed: HEARING NOTICE & ZOOM INFO TO PLTF ATTY & TO DEFN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketEmail Consent by Defendant: IN ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketEmailed: ALTERNATE SERVICE TO PPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM; Dennis, Jack V, JR: Served: 07/07/2022; Returned: 07/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2022-04790: Jpmorgan Chase Bank N.a.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Jpmorgan Chase Bank N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper