Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/12/2021 at 13:51:22 (UTC).

JORGE RAMIREZ vs. JOANA CASTRO

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 JORGE RAMIREZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOANA CASTRO. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0615

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ, JORGE

Fort Worth, TX 76111

Defendants

CASTRO, JOANNA

Fort Worth, TX 76111

CASTRO, JOANA

Fort Worth, TX 76111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Hearing; (11:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerGregory, Christopher) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketPre-Trial Hearing: (1:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerGregory, Christopher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMailed: pltf and emailed defn pretrial notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEmail Consent by Defendant: mayamultiservices1010@gmail.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: via email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (5:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerGregory, Christopher) ; Other; 07/07/2021; Reset by Court to 03/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 3/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCITATION: CASTRO, JOANA: Served: 03/12/2021; Returned: 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: C01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-1121: RAMIREZ, JORGE: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff RAMIREZ, JORGE; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed By Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less