This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/04/2022 at 08:15:21 (UTC).

Jorge Ascencio vs John Christopher Kirkland

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 Jorge Ascencio filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against John Christopher Kirkland. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********67-1

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ascencio, Jorge

Defendant

Kirkland, John Christopher

Fort Worth, TX 76123

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James R. Baudhuin

Defendant Attorney

Amber H. Gregg

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-182596: Kirkland, John Christopher: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Kirkland, John Christopher; Total Financial Assessment: 5.00; Total Payments and Credits: 5.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketJury Fee Payment Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketVacation Letter Index # 6: for Attorney Amber Gregg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: John Christopher Kirkland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialCounter: Receipt # CCL-0377627: Kirkland, John Christopher: (6.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-181674: Ascencio, Jorge: (221.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Ascencio, Jorge; Total Financial Assessment: 364.00; Total Payments and Credits: 364.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCitation: Hold for Pick-up; Kirkland, John Christopher: Served: 05/12/2022; Returned: 05/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: RE: Issuance of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James R. Baudhuin