This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/12/2017 at 11:57:53 (UTC).

John Yamada vs Cheldan Homes, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/20/2016 John Yamada filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cheldan Homes, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********31-1

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yamada, John

Saginaw, TX 76179

Defendants

b/s Allen R. Goss, Jr., Registered Agent

Ft. Worth, TX 76126-1738

Cheldan Homes, LLC

6861 Corporation Parkway, Suite B

Ft. Worth, TX 76126-1738

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Aulstin Gardiner

Defendant Attorney

RUSSELL H DANIELS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2016
  • Dispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Order for Non-Suit Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Notice of Non-Suit Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Amended Original Answer Doc ID#6: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Notice of Change of Address Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Defendant's Original Answer Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Citation: held for legal docment management; Cheldan Homes, LLC: Served: 04/26/2016; Returned: 05/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2: and Request for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-94207: Yamada, John: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-93488: Yamada, John: (259.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Yamada, John; Total Financial Assessment: 261.00; Total Payments and Credits: 261.00; Balance Due as of 03/12/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 259.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-113448: Cheldan Homes, LLC: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-101835: Cheldan Homes, LLC: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-96929: Cheldan Homes, LLC: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Financial Information: Defendant Cheldan Homes, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 6.00; Total Payments and Credits: 6.00; Balance Due as of 03/12/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cheldan Homes, L.P. is a litigant