This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/03/2022 at 14:40:26 (UTC).

John Lolos vs. Lisa R Bertelsmeyer,James A Epps Jr.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 John Lolos filed an Other lawsuit against Lisa R Bertelsmeyer,James A Epps Jr. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7736

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lolos, John

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Defendants

Bertelsmeyer, Lisa R

Fort Worth, TX 76105

Epps Jr., James A

Fort Worth, TX 76105

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

L Marc-Charles Girling

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $5,320.00; Awarded To: John Lolos; Awarded Against: Lisa Bertelsmeyer, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketMailed default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketEvict-Default/Poss/Past Due Rent/CC/Attys Fees: $5320 BR + CC $1500.00 AF $6000.00 BOND $1975.00 MR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed By Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketEviction Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: CTN RTN 05-18-22 CTN EXEC 05-17-22 CRT DATE 06-06-22 @ 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: CTN RTN 05-18-22 CTN EXEC 05-17-22 CRT DATE 06-06-22 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP8-2022-03843: Lolos, John: (190.75)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lolos, John; Total Financial Assessment: 211.75; Total Payments and Credits: 211.75; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 211.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketEVICTION: Bertelsmeyer, Lisa R: Served: 05/17/2022; Returned: 05/18/2022; Epps Jr., James A: Served: 05/17/2022; Returned: 05/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer L Marc-Charles Girling