This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/28/2022 at 04:46:20 (UTC).

JOHN E WILLIAMS vs. OFFICE DEPOT STORE #00216,NICOLE DURHAM

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 JOHN E WILLIAMS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OFFICE DEPOT STORE 00216,NICOLE DURHAM. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5080

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, JOHN E

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Defendants

DURHAM, NICOLE

Fort Worth, TX 76116

OFFICE DEPOT STORE #00216

6680 West Fwy

Fort Worth, TX 76116

SERVE NICOLE DURHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DAVID W WHITEHURST

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Prove Up Hearings; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: SET FOR 4/5/2022 @ 8AM EMAILED VIA OUTLOOK INVITATION TO ALL PARTIES//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEmailed: DEFNS ATTY A COPY OF THE ORIGINAL PETITION FILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketE-Mail Received by Court: BY DEFNS ATTY//REQ COPY OF ORIGINAL PETITION FILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Attorney Contacted Court: ATTY LAWFIRM WANTED TO KNOW IF HEARING CANCELED/CLERK INFORMED CT REC'D ANSWER AND NOT PTM HEARING WILL BE SET/WHEN COURT HAS DATE AND TIME/ATTY WILL RECEIVE NOTIFICATION VIA EMAIL//MLN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated Party Information: UPDATED ATTY FOR DEFN//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Answer FILED FOR DEFN NICOLE BY ATTY//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Answer Filed Office Depot, LLC//EFILED BY ATTY//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketUnrelated Case Party Contacted Court: INTENDS TO REPRESENT THE DEFN/LET HER KNOW CASE IS SET FOR PROVE UP ON 1.28.22/ATTY TO SUBMIT DOCS VIA EFILE//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCITATION: OFFICE DEPOT; SERVE NICOLE DURHAM// CO4// NO; OFFICE DEPOT STORE #00216: Served: 08/31/2021; Returned: 09/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCITATION: CTN ISSUED ON DEFN NICOLE// CO4// NO; DURHAM, NICOLE: Served: 08/31/2021; Returned: 09/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • FinancialInability to Pay Court Cost: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff WILLIAMS, JOHN E; Total Financial Assessment: 0.00; Total Payments and Credits: 0.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketStatement of Inability in Lieu of Filing Fees Granted: HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketStatement of Inability in Lieu of Filing Fees Filed: IN PERSON//HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): SERVE BY CO4 // 2 DEFNS //HG

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE DEPOT/OFFICE MAX is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W Whitehurst