This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/12/2017 at 16:59:58 (UTC).

JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC vs WENDY THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 08/04/2016 JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WENDY THOMPSON. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********87-3

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC

5757 Phantom Dr

Hazelwood, MO 63042

Defendant

THOMPSON, WENDY

Mansfield, TX 76063-2067

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sarah W Nix

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2017
  • Citation: Mailed To Statewide Civil Process; THOMPSON, WENDY: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#12: re: Approved Order Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Letter Requesting Alias Citation Doc ID#11:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Citation: mailed to atty; THOMPSON, WENDY: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#9: Original Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Letter Requesting Alias Citation Doc ID#8:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Order for Rule 106 Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Motion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Doc ID#6: Motion Requesting Substitute Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Letter Doc ID#5: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-119799: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Transaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-116468: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-114684: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-107705: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 279.00; Total Payments and Credits: 279.00; Balance Due as of 03/12/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah W Nix