This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/06/2021 at 04:56:39 (UTC).

Jh Portfolio Debt Equities, Llc Assignee Of Citibank N.a. vs. Johnson Kiai

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Jh Portfolio Debt Equities, Llc Assignee Of Citibank N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Johnson Kiai. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1922

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jh Portfolio Debt Equities, Llc Assignee Of Citibank N.a.

Defendant

Kiai, Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyle Kasner Garza

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketEmailed: DISMISSAL TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal/Want of Prosecution W/O Prejudice Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF/PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketMotion Filed: Citations Returned Unexecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2020-03267: Jh Portfolio Debt Equities, Llc Assignee Of Citibank N.a.: (47.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Jh Portfolio Debt Equities, Llc Assignee Of Citibank N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 47.50; Total Payments and Credits: 47.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 47.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCITATION: PPS-ABC; Kiai, Johnson: Served: 09/11/2020; Returned: 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle Kasner Garza