Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/10/2021 at 10:37:05 (UTC).

JERRY HELM vs. CARRIE MC IVER

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 JERRY HELM filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARRIE MC IVER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7231

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HELM, JERRY DON

Ft. Worth, TX 76179

Defendant

MC IVER, CARRIE

Ft. Worth, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James N. Floyd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Judgment; Awarded To: JERRY HELM; Awarded Against: CARRIE MC IVER; Comment: RET OF PREM ONLY + $875.00 ATTY FEES + CC @ 5.00% INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCourt Notes: ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketBond for Appeal Set: @ $3,400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvict Judgment/Pltf for Possession, Court Costs & Atty Fees: PLTF APPEARED WITH COUNSEL BY ZOOM; DEFN APPEARED BY ZOOM; JUDGMENT FOR PLTF FOR RET OF PREM + $875.00 ATTY FEES + CC @ 5.00% INT; EMAILED TO PLTF AND DEFN ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerBrandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed: BY EFILE - NOTICE ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed: BY EFILE - DOD ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed: BY EFILE; LEASE ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed: BY EFILE - BLANK LEASE ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance Filed: Notice / BY EFILE; ATTY JAMES FLOYD FOR PLTF ; CERT OF SRVC ATTACHED ES

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-01097: HELM, JERRY DON: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff HELM, JERRY DON; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed: IN PERSON; NOTICE TO VACATE W/CMRRR / LEASE ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCDC Declaration Filed: IN PERSON DURING INTAKE OF CASE ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEVICTION: MC IVER, CARRIE: Served: 03/10/2021; Returned: 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued and Sent to C03 for Service: ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEmail Consent by Plaintiff: ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCares Act Affidavit Filed: ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed: WITH DOD ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): HURST *** HOLDOVER - POSS ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James N. Floyd