This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/12/2022 at 04:30:33 (UTC).

Jefferson Capital Systems Llc vs. Michael Simpson

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Jefferson Capital Systems Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael Simpson. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0349

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Simpson, Michael

Fort Worth, TX 76131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: RETURN OF SERVICE//EFILED//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM//HG; Simpson, Michael: Served: 12/08/2021; Returned: 12/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER//HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2021-02052: Jefferson Capital Systems Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Jefferson Capital Systems Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper