Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/01/2021 at 22:37:24 (UTC).

JC Homes, LLC vs. Huyen Vo,Linh Thuy Vo AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 JC Homes, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Huyen Vo,Linh Thuy Vo AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7352

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JC Homes, LLC

1244 Southridge Court Suite 102

Hurst, TX 76053

Defendants

Vo, Linh Thuy

Grand Prairie, TX 75052

Vo, Huyen

Grand Prairie, TX 75052

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David L. Pritchard

Defendant Attorney

JULES P SLIM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDefendant Filed: NOTICE OF CDC DECLARATION TO STAY EXECUTION OF WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP7-2021-03246: CLINT CRAWFORD: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION: Vo, Huyen: Unserved ; Vo, Linh Thuy: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Attorney Contacted Court: CHECK TO SEE IF APPEAL FILED// TOLD HIM NO.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Attorney Contacted Court: CHECK TO SEE IF APPEAL FILED//TOLD HIM NOT YET.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Sanders, Kenneth D) ; Judgment of $0.00; Awarded To: JC Homes, LLC; Awarded Against: Huyen Vo, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed: Plainitff's Exhibit 15 - DEED OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed: Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 -NOTICE TO VACATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: EXEC'T ON MARCH 25, 2021 BY ALT SERVICE X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketRequest For Alternate Service Filed and Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketZoom Hearing Scheduled: 9779 5755 6624 ZOOM EMAILED TO PLFT ATTY AND MAILED TO DEFN X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2021-02390: JC Homes, LLC: (199.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff JC Homes, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 354.50; Total Payments and Credits: 354.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 199.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEVICTION: Vo, Huyen: Served: 03/25/2021; Returned: 03/25/2021; Vo, Linh Thuy: Served: 03/25/2021; Returned: 03/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Petition//MISSING NOTICE TO VACATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JC Homes, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David L. Pritchard