This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/18/2017 at 14:13:36 (UTC).

JASON TALIAFERRO vs. ANGELA CRAYTON AND BRIANNA CRAYTON AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 07/30/2015 JASON TALIAFERRO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANGELA CRAYTON AND BRIANNA CRAYTON AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2780

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TALIAFERRO, JASON

Defendants

CRAYTON, ANGELA

CRAYTON, BRIANNA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $1,632.30; Awarded To: JASON TALIAFERRO; Awarded Against: ANGELA CRAYTON, et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketLetter/Notice Returned Undelivered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketEvict -Judgment / Pltf / Poss/ Past Due Rent / CC: OF $1632.30+CC**CDN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketHearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerWoodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • DocketComments: RET EXEC TO BRIANNA CRAYTON ;AUGUST 17,2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • DocketComments: RET EXEC TO ANGELA CRAYTON ;AUGUST 17,2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: CRAYTON, ANGELA: Served: 08/04/2015; Returned: 08/06/2015; CRAYTON, BRIANNA: Served: 08/04/2015; Returned: 08/06/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketRequest For Alternate Service Filed and Approved: BS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: CRAYTON, ANGELA: Returned Unserved 08/04/2015; Returned: 08/04/2015; CRAYTON, BRIANNA: Returned Unserved 08/04/2015; Returned: 08/04/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): PRINTED AND ISSUED TO CO8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-02644: SULTHAR PROPERTIES LLC: (191.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff TALIAFERRO, JASON; Total Financial Assessment: 191.00; Total Payments and Credits: 191.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 191.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less