This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/29/2022 at 14:31:13 (UTC).

JARRED WATLEY vs. JARREN BROOKS AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 JARRED WATLEY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JARREN BROOKS AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1134

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATLEY, JARRED

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant

BROOKS, JARREN

Ft Worth, TX 76119

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase Summary Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed at Trial (Other than DWOP, Plaintiff, Nons); (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal at Trial Without Prejudice Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEviction Hearing: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) : Result: Dismissed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEVICTION: BROOKS, JARREN: Served: 12/08/2022; Returned: 12/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2022-10295: WATLEY, JARRED: (129.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff WATLEY, JARRED; Total Financial Assessment: 129.00; Total Payments and Credits: 129.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 129.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less