This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/10/2017 at 23:51:39 (UTC).

Jacob Teague, individually and As Next Friend of Brock Teague, a Minor Child vs Continental Foods, Inc., d/b/a Denny's

Case Summary

On 04/22/2014 Jacob Teague, individually and As Next Friend of Brock Teague, a Minor Child filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Continental Foods, Inc , d/b/a Denny's. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********82-1

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Teague, Brock

Teague, Jacob

a Minor

Defendants

Continental Foods, Inc.

d/b/a Denny's

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David William Todd

Defendant Attorney

Shawn Thompson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2014
  • DocketDispositions: Final Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketLetter Doc ID#11: re: trans check for minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • DocketOrder Doc ID#10: Order Discharging Guardian Ad Litem

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • DocketCivil Docket Doc ID#9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • DocketFinal Agreed Judgment Doc ID#8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • DocketMinor Prove Up: (10:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerPierson, Don) : 08/07/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • DocketMotion: Application for Payment of Fees and Motion to Discharge Guardian Ad Litem

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • DocketLetter of Confirmation of Hearing Doc ID#7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketLetter of Confirmation of Hearing Doc ID#6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • DocketRecord - Other: Report of Guardian Ad Litem

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2014
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-12522: Continental Foods, Inc.: (2.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-11854: Continental Foods, Inc.: (2.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-11723: Continental Foods, Inc.: (2.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-11722: Continental Foods, Inc.: (2.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-11686: Continental Foods, Inc.: (241.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DocketFinancial Information: Defendant Continental Foods, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 257.00; Total Payments and Credits: 257.00; Balance Due as of 03/10/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 241.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Continental Foods, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn Thompson