Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/02/2017 at 12:23:46 (UTC).

ITR d/b/a Heavyquip vs Kart Construction & Equipment Co., Inc., and Jerry W. Morgan a/k/a Jerry Wayne Morgan

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 ITR d/b/a Heavyquip filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kart Construction Equipment Co , Inc , and Jerry W Morgan a/k/a Jerry Wayne Morgan. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********45-2

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ITR d/b/a Heavyquip

Defendants

Morgan, Jerry W.

Bellevue, TX 76228

Kart Construction & Equipment Co., Inc.

201 Ussery Street

Bowie, TX 76230

a/k/a Jerry Wayne Morgan

Bellevue, TX 76228

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly A. Guest

Defendant Attorney

Roland P Schafer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2017
  • Suggestion of Bankruptcy Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Defendant's Original Answer Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#7: Duplicate- came in the mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Citation: Attorney; Kart Construction & Equipment Co., Inc.: Served: 04/18/2017; Returned: 04/21/2017; Morgan, Jerry W.: Served: 04/18/2017; Returned: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-118807: ITR d/b/a Heavyquip: (257.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff ITR d/b/a Heavyquip; Total Financial Assessment: 257.00; Total Payments and Credits: 257.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 257.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roland P Schafer