This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/04/2022 at 10:10:27 (UTC).

Investment Retrievers Inc vs. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Investment Retrievers Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against WELLS FARGO BANK, N A. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3108

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Investment Retrievers Inc

P.O. Box 4733

El Dorado Hills, CA 95762

Garnishees

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

211 E 7Th St Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carl Tucker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: CITATION ISSUED OVER 30 DAYS - NO PROOF OF SERVICE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketComments: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT EMAILED TO PLTF ATTY FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketWrit Issued: GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2022-04580: Investment Retrievers Inc: (38.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Investment Retrievers Inc; Total Financial Assessment: 59.00; Total Payments and Credits: 59.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 59.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: ORDER FOR ISSUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: APPLICATION FOR GARN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Investment Retrievers, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant