This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/02/2022 at 02:04:34 (UTC).

Investment Retrievers Inc vs. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Investment Retrievers Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0853

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Investment Retrievers Inc

P.O. Box 4733

El Dorado Hills, CA 95762

Garnishee

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

1999 Bryan St., Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carl Tucker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/ 60 Day: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT: SECOND ALIAS; JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketWrit Issued: EMAILED TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCourt Notes: COURT REACHED OUT TO TJCTC, COURT WILL RESISSUE SECOND ALIAS CITN FOR SERVICE WITH UPDATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT: ALIAS; JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.: Returned Unserved 09/20/2022; Returned: 09/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketWrit Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEmailed: UPDATED WRIT TO PLTF PER REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Filed: PLTF ATTY SENT SUPREME COURT DOCS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Filed: PLTF ATTY REQUESTING FOR NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.: Returned Unserved 08/30/2022; Returned: 08/30/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketOrder Entered on Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketWrit Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-06683: Investment Retrievers Inc: (38.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Investment Retrievers Inc; Total Financial Assessment: 59.00; Total Payments and Credits: 59.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 59.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER FOR ISSUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Garnishment Filed: APPLICATION FOR GARN// XRED DC25183 // WRIT EMAIL TO ctuckerlaw@gmail.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Investment Retrievers, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant