This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 01/05/2022 at 08:09:36 (UTC).

Investment Retrievers Inc vs First National Bank Texas

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Investment Retrievers Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against First National Bank Texas. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********55-1

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Investment Retrievers Inc

Defendants

First National Bank Texas

507 N Gray St

Killeen, TX 76541

b/s registered agent, James W Meredith

Not Classified By Court

Wagnon, Rachel E

Haltom City, TX 76117

aka Rachel Guajardo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carl Tucker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 6: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 8: Writ of Garnishment (First National Bank Texas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Mailed to Attorney 8/30/2021; First National Bank Texas: Served: 10/12/2021; Returned: 10/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-175456: Investment Retrievers Inc: (241.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Investment Retrievers Inc; Total Financial Assessment: 241.00; Total Payments and Credits: 241.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 241.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice Index # 4: Notice of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 3: Affidavit for Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2: Application for Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First National Bank Texas is a litigant

Latest cases where Investment Retrievers, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant