This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/10/2022 at 14:26:25 (UTC).

Investment Retrievers Inc. vs Bank of America, N.A. Gerald R Saylor and Kyle Saylor aka Klye Sayor

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Investment Retrievers Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Bank of America, N A Gerald R Saylor and Kyle Saylor aka Klye Sayor. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********55-2

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Investment Retrievers Inc.

Defendants

Bank of America, N.A.

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

b/s registered agent, C T Corporation System

Not Classified By Court

Saylor, Gerald R

Hurst, TX 76053

Saylor, Kyle

Hurst, TX 76053

aka Klye Sayor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carl Tucker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 8: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Signed non-suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Rymell, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index # 9: without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index # 7: Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice Against Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 6: - Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-182861: Investment Retrievers Inc.: (260.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Investment Retrievers Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 397.00; Total Payments and Credits: 397.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 397.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Mail to Attorney 6/14/22 (Writ/Notice-Kyle Saylor aka Klye Saylor); Bank of America, N.A.: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Mail to Attorney 6/14/22 (Writ/Notice-Gerald R Saylor); Bank of America, N.A.: Served: 07/19/2022; Returned: 07/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Garnishment Index # 5: Notice of Garnishment - Klye Saylor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Garnishment Index # 4: Notice of Garnishment - Gerald R Saylor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 3: Affidavit for Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2: Application for Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Investment Retrievers, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant