This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/03/2022 at 22:37:30 (UTC).

Investment Retrievers Inc vs. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Investment Retrievers Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA, N A. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0761

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Investment Retrievers Inc

P.O. Box 4733

El Dorado Hills, CA 95762

Garnishee

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

1999 Bryan St., Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carl Tucker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/ 60 Day: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketEmailed: ORDER, WRIT AND APPLICATION TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketOrder Entered on Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketWrit Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-04165: Investment Retrievers Inc: (38.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Investment Retrievers Inc; Total Financial Assessment: 59.00; Total Payments and Credits: 59.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 59.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER FOR ISSUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNotice: NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: AFFIDAVIT FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Garnishment Filed: APPLICATION FOR GARN //ctuckerlaw@gmail.com // X-REF DC00018638

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): X-REF DC00018638

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Investment Retrievers, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant