This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/06/2022 at 15:02:42 (UTC).

Integras Capital Recovery, LLC vs. Victoria Kimberlin

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 Integras Capital Recovery, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Victoria Kimberlin. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7782

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Integras Capital Recovery, LLC

10004 Wurzbach Rd #292

San Antonio, TX 78230

Defendant

Kimberlin, Victoria

Haslet, TX 76052

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Adams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketEmailed: order to pltf's atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: NON SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketNotice: COVER LETTER (NS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketEmailed: BAD ADDRESS LTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketBad Address Notification Mailed to Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party: UNEXECUTED / MOVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCITATION: Kimberlin, Victoria: Returned Unserved 09/01/2022; Returned: 09/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: emailed to michaeljadamstx@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-3826: Integras Capital Recovery, LLC: (34.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Integras Capital Recovery, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 55.00; Total Payments and Credits: 55.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Integras Capital Recovery Llc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Adams