This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/13/2022 at 16:32:15 (UTC).

Integras Capital Recovery, Llc vs. Tina Young

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 Integras Capital Recovery, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tina Young. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7783

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Integras Capital Recovery, Llc

10004 Wurzbach Rd #292

San Antonio, TX 78230

Defendant

Young, Tina

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Adams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketHearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: LETTER E-MAILED TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 8/15/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCITATION: Young, Tina: Served: 08/13/2022; Returned: 08/15/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO MICHAELJADAMSTX@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-3830: Integras Capital Recovery, Llc: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Integras Capital Recovery, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Integras Capital Recovery Llc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Adams