This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/30/2022 at 06:12:17 (UTC).

Integras Capital Recovery LLC vs. Francisca Ramirez

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Integras Capital Recovery LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Francisca Ramirez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1883

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Integras Capital Recovery LLC

10004 Wurzbach Rd #292

San Antonio, TX 78230

Defendant

Ramirez, Francisca

North Richland Hills, TX 76182

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Adams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: INQ ON CASE//CLRK GAVE DEFN JP1 WEBSITE TO FILE AN ANSWER//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketOption Letter Mailed: //TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return//EFILED//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CIT AND PETN TO PPS//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAILED ABC LEGAL//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-03408: Integras Capital Recovery LLC: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Integras Capital Recovery LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: MichaelJAdamsTX@abclegal.com//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Integras Capital Recovery Llc is a litigant