This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/02/2020 at 17:33:28 (UTC).

inspiring Gardens LLC vs Alicia Holland

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 inspiring Gardens LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Alicia Holland. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********76-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

inspiring Gardens LLC

1055 Valley Vista Dr

Irving, TX 75003

Defendant

Holland, Alicia

White Settlement, TX 76108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas R. Veach

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • FinancialInability to Pay Court Cost: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail Index #23: Return To Sender Not Deliverable As Addressed - Unable To Forward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #21: electronically served and/or mailed to all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds Index #22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail Index #20: Return To Sender Not Deliverable As Addressed - Unable To Forward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw Funds Index #19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #18: Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialCounter: Receipt # CCL-0373916: inspiring Gardens LLC: (156.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 156.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession - Post Judgment: 2/3/2020 Constable Basket

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketLetter Requesting Setting for Trial Index #8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Holland, Alicia; Total Financial Assessment: 0.00; Total Payments and Credits: 0.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLetter to Pauper Pro Bono Option Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLetter Notifying Parties of Case Filing Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Transcript of Judgment Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Inability to Pay Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Judgment Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Request Source of Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Sworn Complaint for Eviction Index #2:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOCA Appeal Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less